judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT L. SCHERER, II v. LARAMIE REGIONAL AIRPORT BOARD

Case Heading (S-09-0196)
Case Number:S-09-0196Case Docketed On:10/08/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Property
Short Title:ROBERT L. SCHERER, II v. LARAMIE REGIONAL AIRPORT BOARD
Full Title:ROBERT L. SCHERER, II, Appellant (Defendant), v. LARAMIE REGIONAL AIRPORT BOARD, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert L. Scherer IITheodore C. Preston
AppelleeLaramie Regional Airport BoardMatthew F.G. Castano

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2010 WY 105
Citation:236 P.3d 996

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/08/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/25/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/08/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Laramie Regional Airport BoardEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/13/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/26/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/28/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docket -OrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Robert L. Scherer, IIEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/30/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/30/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/17/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/17/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/18/10/.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal