judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JACKLYN MORGAN V. UNITED PLANNING ORGANIZATION

Case Information: 11-AA-0173
Short Caption:JACKLYN MORGAN V. UNITED PLANNING ORGANIZATIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02953-10Filed Date:02/18/2011

Opening Event Date:02/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/20/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJacklyn Morgan N
Sara Nejad-Fathi YN
RespondentUnited Planning N
Deborah L. McArthurYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/18/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
02/18/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/01/2011ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and petitioner is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply wtih this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
03/11/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - of order dated 3/1/11 denying IFP
03/23/2011ORDER DENY PETITIONER MOTTION FOR RECONSIDERATION and petitioner is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review.
04/04/2011FILING FEE
04/12/2011 On consideration fot he lodged petition for review, and it appearing that pettioenr has tendered the $100 fee, and it appearing that United Planning organization is a business that must be represetned by counsel, it is ORDERED that the lodged petition for review is filed nunc pro tunc to February 18, 2011. It is (MORE)
04/12/2011 F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
04/12/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
05/10/2011APPEARANCE- of Sara Fathi-Nejad on behalf of petitioner
05/11/2011APPEARANCE - Deborah McArthur on behalf of Resp.
06/03/2011RECEIVED - a courtesy copy of ltr sent to the petitioner regarding preparation of the record and transcript (filed by OAH)
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Aug. 31, 2011) (Petitioner)Granted
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Aug. 31, 2011) (Petitioner)
08/31/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
08/31/2011FiledAppendix Attached to Brief (Petitioner)
09/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
10/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) 10/21/11
10/21/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
10/21/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/21/2011FiledAppendix (respondent) (Respondent)
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/08/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judge Fisher, Steadman
03/28/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
04/20/2012FiledMandate
04/30/2012FiledMotion of the Office of Administrative Hearings motion to publish memorandum opinion and judgmentDenied
05/04/2012FiledOrder Denying OAH motion to publish MOJ.