judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ASHLIE CHURCHILL v. CAMPBELL COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Case Heading (S-09-0195)
Case Number:S-09-0195Case Docketed On:10/08/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:ASHLIE CHURCHILL v. CAMPBELL COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Full Title:ASHLIE CHURCHILL, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CAMPBELL COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAshlie ChurchillNicholas H. Carter
Stephanie Marie Humphrey
AppelleeCampbell County Memorial HospitalBillie LM Addleman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2010 WY 86
Citation:234 P.3d 366

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/08/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/08/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/25/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/04/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authority from counsel for Appellee.Notice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing, Justice Golden writing for the Court, Justice Kite filed a specially concurring opinion in which Justice Burke joinedOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/13/2010Record - Transmitted record on appealRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/13/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/16/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/14/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal