judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD WATKINS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CV-0180
Short Caption:RONALD WATKINS V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8150-02Filed Date:02/11/2011

Opening Event Date:02/11/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/04/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Watkins NPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
James C. McKay, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 11, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX
03/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/08/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/04/2011APPENDIX
04/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to aple's motion for summary affirmance and aplt's motion for an expedited appeal and oral argument.
05/04/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo - reply
05/04/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY- to aplt's oppo to aple's motion for sumamry affirmance
06/30/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE***
06/30/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (GLRDTE)
07/11/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
08/10/2011FiledOrder directing appellee within 14 days from the date of this order to file a response to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
08/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)
08/22/2011FiledOpposition to Appellee's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Opposition to Petition for Rehearing En Banc. (Appellant)
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file opposition to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc on or before September 23, 2011. (Appellee)
09/21/2011FiledOpposition - to aplt's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellee)
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - a response to aple's opposition to aplt's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)
09/22/2011LodgedAnswer/Response - to aple's opposition to aplt's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (NOTE: The response is included in the motion for leave) (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledAnswer/Response to opposition to pet for reh/reh en banc (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se pet for reh/reh en banc and granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged response and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged response of appellant to opposition to pet for reh/reh en banc
01/04/2012FiledMandate