judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JIMMIE McMASTERS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0107)
Case Number:S-11-0107Case Docketed On:04/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JIMMIE McMASTERS v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: JIMMIE McMASTERS, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJimmie McMastersRobert A. Nicholas
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionGregory A. Phillips
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2012 WY 32
Citation:271 P.3d 422

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/28/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/14/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/16/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/22/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/02/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/14/2012Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/14/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Attorney Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/03/2012Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/03/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/06/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 4/4/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal