judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARRELL MYLES V. PRINCE SECURITY

Case Information: 11-AA-0154
Short Caption:DARRELL MYLES V. PRINCE SECURITYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES2438-10Filed Date:02/14/2011

Opening Event Date:02/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/14/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/04/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDarrell Myles YPro SeN
RespondentPrince SecurityN
Thomas B. MartinNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/14/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
02/14/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
02/24/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to February 14, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
02/24/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
03/15/2011MISCELLANEOUS - ltr from Joyce Price on behalf of respondent as future contact person.
03/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 24, 2011, directing respondent to identify its its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
04/07/2011APPEARANCE - of Thomas B. Martin attorney for the respondent (Prince Security)
04/12/2011LETTER - from counsel stating that respondent will not be submitting a brief in this case
04/13/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's brief
04/13/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's appdx (attached to brief)
07/19/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/11/15/10 hearing
07/19/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/25/2011FiledAmended Order
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
07/25/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
07/25/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/02/2011FiledReceived - 7/25/11 order returned from post office. sent to file room. (Petitioner)
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/14/2011FiledSubmitted before Newman, Belson, Schwelb
12/14/2011FiledRemanded (MOJ) (Newman, Belson and Schwelb, Senior Judges.)
01/04/2012FiledMandate