judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMIE WONG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0106)
Case Number:S-11-0106Case Docketed On:04/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:JAMIE WONG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMIE WONG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJamie WongDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/06/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
06/13/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/13/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/14/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/29/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Second Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/01/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/14/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for third extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2011Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/21/2011Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
09/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/04/2011Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
11/04/2011Event - Phone Call to District Court regarding remand. Matter is still under advisement.EventPhone CallFinal
12/06/2011Event - Phone Call to District Judge re remand. Still under advisement, law clerk working on final decision and he will notify this court when it is finished.EventPhone CallFinal
12/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Status report - other. Received e-mail notification from Judge Arnold that the motion to withdraw guilty plea will be granted and order will be filed this date.Notice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
01/10/2012Event - Phone Call to public defender, will file motion to dismiss.EventPhone CallFinal
01/10/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
01/11/2012Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of DismissalRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
01/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/12/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal