judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BALLY'S LINEN VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36385
Short Caption:BALLY'S LINEN VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A410958Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cohen, Johnson, Day, Jones & Royal--check no. 5697.
07/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-11442
07/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Verification of Counsel. 00-11443
07/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy. 00-11444
07/05/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay Pending Determination of Petition for Special Writ. 00-11446
07/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[We defer ruling on petitioner's motion for a stay.] 00-12177
07/14/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. 00-12164
07/18/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Reply to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.
08/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[We deny petitioner's motion for a stay; the motion is moot.] SNP99BWM-MS/NB 00-14360
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-14434
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.