judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAMPTON (RICKY) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34931
Short Caption:HAMPTON (RICKY) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - HC/PC2792Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/06/1999Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition. 99-09613
12/06/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12133
01/04/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-00074
01/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Denying Declaratory Relief. Petitioner apparently seeks an order from this court directing the respondent district court to enter a written order resolving petitioner's motion to withdraw a guilty plea. fn1[On December 6, 1999, in this same matter, this court denied a petition for a writ of mandamus or prohibition in which petitioner sought an order from this court directing the district court to file an order resolving a habeas corpus petition]. We deny petitioner's request. 00-00943