judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD LAWRENCE V. U.S. BANK NATIONAL

Case Information: 11-CV-0182
Short Caption:RICHARD LAWRENCE V. U.S. BANK NATIONALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB32282-09Filed Date:02/15/2011

Opening Event Date:02/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/30/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/06/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard Lawrence NPro SeN
AppelleeU.S. Bank National AssociationN
Renee O. DysonNN
Benjamin H. Rosen NN
Kristin ZechYY
Amy S. OwensNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on February 15, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
03/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
03/08/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 12/10/10, 1/3/11, 1/4/11, 1/5/11, 1/12/11 & 3/1/11) (elp)
03/09/2011TMC - EMERGENCY motion for stay - oppo
03/11/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for stay
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS LW
03/14/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED as he does not meet the standard for granting of a stay. See Banks v. Eastern Savings Bank, 8 A.3d 1239 (DC 2010)...SEE HARDCOPY (RDKRTE) (rm)
03/14/2011TMC - appellant's motion for sactions - appellant's motion for reconsideration
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
03/17/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion for and sanctions
03/18/2011On consideration of appellant's motion for sanctions and appellant's motion for reconsideration of the order denying his motion for stay wherein the only error appellant raises was teh court's entry of the order without waiting for a reply, it is ORDERED that the motion is denied. SEE ORDER MORE (RDKRTE)
03/18/2011FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for sanctions is denied. (RDKRTE)
03/23/2011APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (8-pgs/tape 12/10/10 proc.)w/cd
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (9-pgs/tape 1/4/11 proc.)
03/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (12-pgs/tape 3/1/11 proc.)
03/28/2011TMC - petition for rehearing
03/29/2011FiledRECORD INDEX
03/31/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not accept for filing any further motions for reconsiderations and or rehearing from the denial of appellant's motions to stay and for sanctions. (RDKRTE) (rm)
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (13-pgs/tape 1/3/11 proc.)
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (10-pgs/tape 1/5/11 proc.)
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (9-pgs/tape 1/12/11 proc.) w/cd
04/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/13/2011MISCELLANEOUS- from aplt re: affidavit of aplt for bias or prejudice of judge in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 144
04/20/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF appendix attached
05/31/2011APPENDIX
06/30/2011APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for Leave to Supplement Appendix.
06/30/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/30/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/08/2011APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file supplement appendix (amended)
07/14/2011FiledOpposition to Aple's motion for leave to supplement the appendix (titiled as: RESPONSE AND MOTION TO OPPOSE APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX) (Appellant)
07/20/2011FiledNotice Received from aple re: letting court know that on 7/19 aple forwarded aple's brief in oppo , motion for leave to supplement the apdx, supplemental appdx, & amended motion for leave to supplement the appdx to aplt (Appellee)
08/08/2011FiledOrder Granting amended motion for leave to file supplement appendix. .
08/08/2011FiledSupplemental Appendix to Appellee's Brief.
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/16/2011FiledReceived - RETURNED MAIL - Order dated 8/8/11, mailed to appellant Richard Lawrence at the most current address of record - 340 Decatur Street, NW, Washington, DC 20011, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and filed this date. elp (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/25/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Blackburne-Rigsby, Pryor
07/13/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
08/06/2012FiledMandate