judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTIN (MICIAH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36407
Short Caption:MARTIN (MICIAH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991788Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12018
07/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/24/00; 4/28/00 and 5/1/00 through 5/3/00. Court Reporter: J. Schonlau. Filed in district court on: 7/10/00. 00-12134
07/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Docket Entries. Due Date: 10 days
07/28/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 24, 2000; April 28, 2000; May 1,2,3, 2000. Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. 00-13098
08/18/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: August 28, 2000. 00-14534
08/30/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-15290
08/30/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-15291
09/20/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-16623
02/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-03228
03/20/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03367
03/20/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 27, 2001. 01-03367