judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARVIN TILLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0098)
Parent:S-11-0098Case Docketed On:04/22/2011
Consolidated: S-11-0099
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:MARVIN TILLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARVIN TILLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarvin TilleyJames P. Castberg
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 153
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/22/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/22/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/06/2011Motion - OtherMotionOtherFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - motion to join appeals.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2011Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
06/08/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/27/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/15/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight total volumes. Volume I (S-11-0098) & Volume I (S-11-0099); Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volumes III-VI, Transcripts; Volumes VII-VIII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/15/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/16/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re letter regarding assignment to expedited docket, counsel has no objectionEventPhone CallFinal
11/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/28/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/05/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/01/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal