judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANGELO MARQUIS SHEPHARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0150
Short Caption:ANGELO MARQUIS SHEPHARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD9036-10Filed Date:02/09/2011

Opening Event Date:02/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/13/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAngelo Marquis Shephard YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Walter Booth, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Walter Booth, Esquire
02/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
03/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (130pgs/Tape) 2/1/11 proc. w/CD
03/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/28/2011RECORD INDEX
03/28/2011RECORD COPIES
03/29/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/05/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 18, 2011 (no oppo)
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 18, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to July 28, 2011 (no oppo). (Appellant)
07/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
07/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/26/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
08/30/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
08/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellant)Granted
09/06/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET AND APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE SHALL BE FILED BY OCTOBER 12, 2011.
10/12/2011FiledOpposition to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledOrder Granting SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/15/2011FiledAffirmed
11/21/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/13/2011FiledMandate