judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTI v. CITY OF PLEASANTON, ET AL.

Case: A-4543
A-4543
03/08/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTI
CITY OF PLEASANTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/31/1955Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/22/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/12/1954Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/04/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/14/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/13/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/31/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/24/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/31/1955Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/30/1955Motion for leave to file brief
03/22/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/09/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
03/09/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
03/09/1955Opinion issued
06/12/1954Response to Brief filed
06/04/1954Supplemental Brief filed
05/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/18/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/14/1954Brief in Support of Petition
05/13/1954Brief on the Merits
03/31/1954Reply to Response
03/24/1954Response to Petition
03/08/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Pleasanton, et al.Respondent
J. H. StarleyAmicus Curiae
City of Corpus ChristiPetitioner
High Plains Underground Water Conservation District No. 1Amicus Curiae
State Board of Water Engineers of the State of TexasAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information