judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife, and as joint tenants v. GALEN DUNMIRE and REBECCA DUNMIRE, husband and wife, as joint tenants and JAMES HEDSTROM and DONNA HEDSTROM, husband and wife, as joint tenants

Case Heading (S-09-0203)
Case Number:S-09-0203Case Docketed On:10/13/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife, and as joint tenants v. GALEN DUNMIRE and REBECCA DUNMIRE, husband and wife, as joint tenants and JAMES HEDSTROM and DONNA HEDSTROM, husband and wife, as joint tenants
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF KITE RANCH, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company: POWELL FAMILY OF YAKIMA, LLC, a Washington limited liability company, DOUGLAS BRICKMAN, individually, and DOUGLAS BRICKMAN and ANNE BRICKMAN, husband and wife, and as joint tenants, Appellants (Defendants), v. GALEN DUNMIRE and REBECCA DUNMIRE, husband and wife, as joint tenants and JAMES HEDSTROM and DONNA HEDSTROM, husband and wife, as joint tenants, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPowell Family of Yakima, LLC a Washington limited liability companyF. Scott Peasley
AppellantDouglas BrickmanF. Scott Peasley
AppellantAnne BrickmanF. Scott Peasley
AppelleeGalen DunmireGreg Weisz
AppelleeRebecca DunmireGreg Weisz
AppelleeJames HedstromWilliam H. Vines
AppelleeDonna HedstromWilliam H. Vines

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities
Opinion Number:2010 WY 83
Citation:234 P.3d 351

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/13/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/13/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/30/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Powell Family of Yakima, LLC, Douglas and Anne Brickman and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2010Motion - Exclude from electronic filing filed by counsel for Appellees HedstromMotionExclude from electronic filingFinal
01/08/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/12/2010Order - Denying Motion for Waiver of Electronic Filing RequirementsOrderDenyFinal
01/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated motion for extension of time in which to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Grant - extension of time - Order granting motion for extension of time in which to file brief.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/19/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/19/2010Brief - Appellee with statement of costs.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees Brief Dunmire and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees James Hedstrom and Donna HedstromEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/17/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/17/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Vacate & Re-Set Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/18/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
03/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - F. Scott Peasley for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, William H. Vines, counsel for Appellees James and Donna Hedstrom.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/31/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from M. Gregory Weisz, counsel for Appellees DunmireNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/13/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (F. Scott Peasley for appellant; William H. Vines and Michael (Greg) G. Weisz for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/13/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/24/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/12/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/13/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal