judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONNIE MARIE POWELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0094)
Case Number:S-11-0094Case Docketed On:04/15/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CONNIE MARIE POWELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CONNIE MARIE POWELL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantConnie Marie PowellDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Jeffrey Scott Pope
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 106
Citation:282 P.3d 163

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/15/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court. (Notice received 04/5/11, order to proceed IFP did not appoint Public Defender's Office to represent Appellant. Docketing delayed until order Nunc Pro Tunc filed.)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/01/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/02/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/07/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Second Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Motion for Removal of ExhibitsNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/29/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/30/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for third extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2011Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/21/2011Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
09/21/2011Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
09/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for partial remand; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2011Order - Remand - Calene - Order granting motion for partial remandOrderRemand - CaleneFinal
12/23/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion re Calene remandRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
01/03/2012Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order on remand for Calene hearingRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder on remandFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court after remandNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Resuming briefing scheduleNotice-OutgoingResuming briefing scheduleFinal
02/21/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/09/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/17/2012Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for order vacating and resetting oral argument; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/18/2012Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/23/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/23/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/24/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/03/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, thirteen volumes. Volumes 1-3, original papers; Volume 4, Jury instructions and verdict; Volumes 5-8, transcripts; Volumes 9-12, Exhibits; Volume 13, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/03/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Tina N. Olson obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/24/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jeffrey Pope obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/13/2012Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/14/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice. Argued before Chief Justice Kite and Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (Tina N. Olson, Appellate Counsel for Appellant; Jeffrey Scott Pope, Assistant Attorney General for Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/07/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 8/8/2012 by agent for warden at WWC.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/23/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/24/2012Service - Other - Receipt of Record signed by Clerk of District Court - record was received by hand delivery.ServiceOtherFinal
08/28/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - copy of mandate signed for by agent for Warden at WWC.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal