judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

R. A. IRWIN v. RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.

Case: A-4553
A-4553
03/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
R. A. IRWIN
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/06/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/15/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/23/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/07/1954Motion for emergency stay filedOverruled
05/06/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/15/1954Letter Filed
04/15/1954Reply to Response
03/23/1954Response to Petition
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. A. IrwinPetitioner
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information