judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEVE R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0147
Short Caption:STEVE R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD8505-10Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/13/2012
Argued/Submitted:06/29/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/27/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSteve R. Williams Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Stratton C. Strand YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/17/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
03/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (152pgs/Tape) 11/15/10 proc.
03/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (140pgs/Tape) 11/16/10 proc. w/CD
03/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/16/2011RECORD INDEX
03/16/2011RECORD COPIES
03/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 17, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/05/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (unopposed)
04/05/2011RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript (attached to MOLV)
04/18/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
04/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
06/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 45 days
06/27/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 15, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/24/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file th brief until September 13, 2011
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until September 27, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/20/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until September 27, 2011
09/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief by an additional seven days (Appellant)Granted
10/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix
10/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/14/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until January 12, 2012
01/12/2012FiledMotion - for leave to supplement the record (Appellee)Granted
01/12/2012FiledBrief w/appendix (Appellee)
01/13/2012FiledBriefing Completed
01/25/2012FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion to supplement the record
01/25/2012FiledSupplemental Record #3 (goverment exhibits 1, 3, 4, 7, 8, 9, 13, 25 and 26) (see appellee's brief and appendix for exhibitis)
02/02/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)Granted
02/10/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/15/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged reply brief and the lodged reply brief is filed.
02/15/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
02/21/2012FiledMotion for leave to file to amend appellant's reply brief (Appellant)Granted
03/07/2012LodgedReply Brief (2nd Amended) (Appellant)
03/16/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the appellant's amended reply brief
03/16/2012FiledReply Brief (AMENDED) (Appellant)
03/20/2012FiledMotion for leave to amend appellant's reply brief (2nd amended) (Appellant)Granted
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/18/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the amended reply brief
04/18/2012FiledReply Brief (2nd AMENDED) (Appellant)
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
06/29/2012FiledArgued before Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Easterly George E. Rickman, Esq. for appellant Stratton C. Strand, Esq. for appellee
08/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly, Beckwith, and Easterly, Associate Judges.)
09/10/2012WithdrawnMandate************RECALLED 9/19/12
09/11/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and or petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
09/17/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE and PETITION FOR REHEARING
09/19/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE PETITION FOR REHEARING/EN BANC
09/19/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
11/19/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
11/27/2012FiledMandate
11/28/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)