judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONT E. HAMBLIN, III v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0095)
Case Number:S-11-0095Case Docketed On:04/18/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:MONT E. HAMBLIN, III v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MONT E. HAMBLIN, III, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMont E. Hamblin IIIDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/18/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Original notice of completion was lost in mail. District Clerk resent on 04/15/2011)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/21/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Second Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/25/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
07/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/28/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal