judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BREWSTER (BRIAN) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 36419
Short Caption:BREWSTER (BRIAN) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR96P0860Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/13/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12136
08/07/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13674
08/07/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-13679
08/24/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14893
10/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it was not properly raised in a post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus, " . . . the order of the district court dismissing appellant's habeas petition is affirmed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-WM/ML/NB 00-17984
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18215
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-18215