judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUIS MEDINA V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Case Information: 11-AA-0161
Short Caption:LUIS MEDINA V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Human Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DHS502-10Filed Date:02/16/2011

Opening Event Date:02/16/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLuis Medina YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Human ServicesN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/16/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
02/16/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/01/2011ORDER DENY PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is denied without prejudice to its renewal within 20 days from the date of this order by filing a fully completed motion and financial information statement or tender the $100 filing fee. See D.C. App. R. 24(b). Failure to comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this petition for review. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW)
03/08/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/23/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to February 16, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
03/23/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & KIM
08/04/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 11/30/10 hearing
08/04/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/05/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/20/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and limited appendix
10/27/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
10/27/2011FiledDismissed
03/07/2012FiledMandate