judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DR. RICHARD Q. LEWIS v. KRUEGER, HUTCHINSON AND OVERTON CLINIC

Case: A-4533
A-4533
03/01/1954
Application for Writ of Error
DR. RICHARD Q. LEWIS
KRUEGER, HUTCHINSON AND OVERTON CLINIC
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/10/1954Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/10/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/1954Letter Filed
07/21/1954Opinion issued
07/12/1954Notice of Settlement
07/10/1954Motion to dismiss
07/10/1954Motion for Rehearing
06/30/1954Concurring Opinion issued.
06/30/1954Opinion issued
05/10/1954Response to Brief filed
05/10/1954Supplemental Brief filed
04/07/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/01/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. Richard Q. LewisPetitioner
Krueger, Hutchinson and Overton ClinicRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information