judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO D. CLARK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 07-CF-0096
Short Caption:ANTONIO D. CLARK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6781-03Filed Date:01/05/2007

Opening Event Date:01/05/2007Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/03/2009Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/06/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/27/2010
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/02/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio D. Clark YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/05/2007NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/07/2007 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding the transcript ordered for this appeal. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (GP)
03/07/2007APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Mindy A. Daniels, Esquire
04/06/2007STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
06/03/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (121 pgs/Gilliam) 9/21/06 proc.
06/03/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (401 pgs/Schertzer) 9/25-29/06 proc.
06/03/2009RECORD COMPLETED
06/05/2009FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (pleadings --- sealed)
06/05/2009RECORD INDEX
06/05/2009RECORD COPIES
06/10/2009 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP)
07/20/2009APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until October 10, 2009 (no oppo)
07/28/2009 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before October 10, 2009. (GP)
10/13/2009APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until October 26, 2009
10/28/2009 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that appellant's brief was not lodged with this court on or before October 26, 2009, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 15 days from the date of the order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (GP)
11/02/2009APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/02/2009APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD with documents and transcripts of proceedings designated in Appendices A and B (unopposed)
11/02/2009APPENDIX
11/10/2009APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF tp 1/6/10 no oppo
11/20/2009ORDERED that appellant's motion to supplement is granted and the Clerk shall file those documents contained in appellant's limited appendix A & B as a supplemental record. F/O that appellee's motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 6, 2010. (ETW)
11/20/2009SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (see appellant's limited appendix A & B)
01/06/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/06/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/16/2010FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/17/2010 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2010 through May 2010, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 23, 2010, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Garland Pinkston, Jr. Clerk
02/22/2010LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
03/24/2010CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/20/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (unopposed)
05/20/2010RECEIVED - Appellant's Reply Brief
05/26/2010ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is filed. (TH,OB,BE)
05/26/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
05/27/2010FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/27/2010ARGUED before Judges Thompson, Oberly, and Belson Mindy A. Daniels, Esq. for the APPELLANT Elizabeth H. Danello, Esq. for the APPELLEE
06/23/2010AFFIRMED MOJ (Thompson, Oberly, Belson)
07/07/2010APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB to 8/7/10. no oppo
07/13/2010ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EB on or before August 9, 2010. (WH)
08/09/2010APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
10/22/2010ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (WHRZRDGLKRBRTHOBBE) (Judge Fisher is recused from this case.)
11/02/2010MANDATE ISSUED
01/31/2011NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI
04/28/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER