judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTHONY VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36418
Short Caption:ANTHONY VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A418073Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/12/2001 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:03/12/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/13/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kummer firm-check no. 29418.
07/13/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Writ of Mandamus. 00-12089
07/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Proceedings on Petition for Writ of Prohibition or alternatively, Writ of Mandamus. 00-12090
07/13/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Verification. 00-12091
07/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Writ; Verification; and Motion for Stay). 00-12096
07/19/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Proceedings on Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Writ of Mandamus. 00-12461
07/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real parties in interest: 30 days from the date of this order. fn1[Petitioners also seek a stay of the district court proceedings. They have not, however, complied with the dictates of NRAP 8(a), which requires that a stay first be sought in the district court. We deny petitioners' motion for a stay.] 00-13163
08/04/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Petitioners Layfe Robert Anthony, M.D., Norman Fawson, M.D., McKay Christian, M.D., Kerry Stratford, M.D., Howard Chamberlain, M.D., Clark Staheli, M.D., Kirk Watkins, M.D., and dba St. George Clinic's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Stay. 00-13525
08/04/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Substantive Joinder in Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Writ of Mandamus (Nevada Supreme Court Case No. 36418). 00-13563
08/14/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition to Defendant Nancy R. Davis, CFNP's, Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Writ of Mandamus 00-14146
08/14/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Defendant Nancy R. Davis, CFNP's, Substantive Joinder in Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Writ of Mandamus 00-14150
08/15/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Petitioners filed a notice on August 4, 2000, withdrawing their July 13, 2000, motion for stay. The motion for stay having been denied on July 31, 2000, no action will be taken with regard to the August 4, 2000, notice. 00-14256
08/23/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Correction. This notice corrects the title of the answer that was filed on 8/14/00. AH. 00-14805
01/29/2001MotionFiled Motion. Emergency Request for Expedited Decision. 01-01888
01/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on March 12, 2001, at 2:30 p.m. (SNP01A-CY/ML/NB)
02/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 29, 2001, this court issued a notice scheduling this matter for oral argument on March 12, 2001. Later that same day, the real parties in interest filed an Emergency Request for Expedited Decision. This matter having been scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar, we deny the real parties in interest's request, as moot. 01-02357
02/27/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
03/12/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB.
05/10/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Emergency Motion to Dismiss Supreme Court No. 36418 or, Alternatively, Motion to Supplement Record. 01-07832
05/17/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Petitioners' Opposition to Real Parties in Interest's Emergency Motion to Dismiss Supreme Court Number 36418 or, Alternatively, Motion to Supplement Record. 01-08191
05/21/2001MotionFiled Motion. Joinder in Petitoners' Opposition to Real Parties in Interest's Emergency Motion to Dismiss Supreme Court Number 36418 or, Alternatively, Motion to Supplement Record. 01-08438
05/29/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. 01-08870
06/01/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Provide Additional Supplemental, Updated Information Regarding Personal Jurisdiction. 01-09167
06/07/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Petitioners' Opposition to Real Parties in Interest's Motion to Provide Additional Supplemental, Updated Information Regarding Personal Jurisdiciton. 01-09493
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Granting Petition for Writ of Prohibition. fn10[We deny real parties in interest's May 10, 2001, emergency motion to dismiss or alternatively supplement the record based on the assertion that Dr. Anthony had reactivated his Nevada medical license. We also deny real parties in interest's motion to file a reply to petitioners' opposition to the May 10, 2001, motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proposed reply received on May 29, 2001. We also deny real parties in interest's June 1, 2001, motion to provide additional information. We conclude that neither the Clinic, nor its practitioners, should be subject to the jurisdiction of our state merely because Mrs. Williams unilaterally carried the consequences of her treatment into Nevada. " . . . we grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition." Young, J. and Leavitt, J. Becker, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09748
06/12/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney John Peter Lee. Returned unfiled the original Proposed Reply to Petitioners' Opposition to Real parties In Interest's Emergency Motion to Dismiss Supreme Court Number 36418 or, Alternatively, Motion to Supplement Record.
06/12/2001WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Thomas F. Kummer for service upon Judge Allen R. Earl (successor to Judge Redmon). 01-09761
06/27/2001WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Earl on June 22, 2001. 01-09761
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-10313
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.