judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DAMON HILL v. TEXAS, NEW MEXICO AND OKLAHOMA COACHES, INC.

Case: A-4532
A-4532
03/01/1954
Application for Writ of Error
DAMON HILL
TEXAS, NEW MEXICO AND OKLAHOMA COACHES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/02/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/15/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/25/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/12/1954Response to Motion filed
11/02/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/20/1954Opinion issued
06/15/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/25/1954Response to Petition
05/25/1954Additional Copies received
03/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/01/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Damon HillPetitioner
Texas, New Mexico and Oklahoma Coaches, Inc.Respondent
G. H. Penland, O. O. TouchstoneAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information