judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DUANE A. JONES V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL.

Case Information: 11-CV-0151
Short Caption:DUANE A. JONES V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9568-10Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDuane A. Jones YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeStarbucks Coffee CompanyN
Christopher E. HassellNY
AppelleeArchdiocese of WashingtonN
Amy B. MogetzNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/22/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for having been IMPROPERLY FILED as no final order has been designated for review...OR for having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY:ETW)
02/22/2011TMC - OTSC - motion for summary affirmance
03/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (Starbucks)
06/06/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED because appellant failed to designate the order for review... It is ****MORE****
06/06/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED AS MOOT. (FIBEKG)
06/06/2011DISMISSED
06/28/2011MANDATE ISSUED