judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EVANS VS. EVANS

Case Information: 36417
Short Caption:EVANS VS. EVANSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9500588Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/26/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/13/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robin Wright, Attorney-check no. 2148.
07/13/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12077
07/18/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney David A. Hardy requesting an opportunity to respond to an order to show cause. 00-12384
07/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-12537
07/26/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on 07/25/00. 00-12968
07/26/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[In light of this order, we deny attorney David A. Hardy's request to submit a respose on behalf of respondent.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14355
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 returned this day. 00-14437
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 15, 2000. 00-14437