judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HOME INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK v. LEWIS J. COX

Case: A-4535
A-4535
03/02/1954
Application for Writ of Error
HOME INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK
LEWIS J. COX
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/22/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/07/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/06/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
04/27/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/11/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/02/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/22/1954Brief on the Merits
09/22/1954Affidavit filed
07/07/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/23/1954Opinion issued
05/06/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
04/27/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/31/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/11/1954Response to Petition
03/02/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/02/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Melton and TitusAmicus Curiae
Lewis J. CoxRespondent
Home Insurance Company of New YorkPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information