judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DERRICK LEE BROCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0108)
Case Number:S-11-0108Case Docketed On:05/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DERRICK LEE BROCK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DERRICK LEE BROCK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDerrick Lee BrockTamara Schroeder Crolla
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 13
Citation:272 P.3d 933

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/17/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Tamara K. Schroeder for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Substitution of CounselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/14/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/14/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
06/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to WithdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/14/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
06/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/15/2011Order - Grant - extension of time (45-day extension granted)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/04/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/19/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tamara Schroeder for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Daraie for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/17/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/09/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tamara Kay Schroeder for appellant; Justin A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/06/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/23/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/23/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/23/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/27/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/24/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal