judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WOODS (FREDERICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36408
Short Caption:WOODS (FREDERICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9400660CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12020
08/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14653
09/14/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: September 18, 2000. 00-16220
09/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-16459
09/18/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-16460
09/27/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-17129
10/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they are without merit, " . . . the order of the district court is affirmed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. 00-18851
11/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19393
11/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 22, 2000. 00-19393