judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATHERLY (MATTHEW) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36409
Short Caption:MATHERLY (MATTHEW) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR992140Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12021
08/11/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14068
08/11/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-14070
08/18/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14526
10/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for resentencing before a different district judge." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-18084
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18181
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-18181