judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DC DEPT OF THE ENVIRONMENT V. POTOMAC CREEK ASSOC.,LLP, ETAL

Case Information: 11-AA-0153
Short Caption:DC DEPT OF THE ENVIRONMENT V. POTOMAC CREEK ASSOC.,LLP, ETALClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DEIA200182-10Filed Date:02/11/2011

Opening Event Date:02/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerD.C. Deptartment of the EnvironmentN
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveNY
RespondentProvidence HospitalN
RespondentHoward UniversityN
Michael A. Maddox NN
RespondentHoward University General HospitalN
Michael A. Maddox NN
RespondentMarriott Wardman Park HotelN
Michael K. RossNN
RespondentPotomac Creek Associates LlpN
Robert N. Steinwurtzel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/11/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/03/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
03/28/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
04/14/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL with each party to bear their own costs. see D.C. App. R. 13(b). (ETW)
04/14/2011DISMISSED
05/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED
11/18/2011LodgedRecord On Appeal