judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4550
A-4550
03/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
J. J. PERKINS, ET AL.
L. E. MITCHELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1954Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/19/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/08/1978Miscellaneous letter
12/21/1956Returned document(s). See Remarks.
07/05/1954Response to Motion filed
06/24/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/09/1954Opinion issued
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/19/1954Response to Petition
03/09/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/09/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. J. Perkins, et al.Petitioner
L. E. MitchellRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information