judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NOVA-OCAMPO (RENE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36401
Short Caption:NOVA-OCAMPO (RENE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR992197Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/11/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-11904
07/11/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: March 20, 2000 and March 21, 2000. Court Reporter: I. Zihn. Filed in district court on: July 7, 2000. 00-11906
07/20/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: March 20-21, 2000. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 00-12531
08/22/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: August 28, 2000. 00-14683
08/29/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-15194
08/29/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-15195
09/12/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-16052
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having concluded that appellant's contention lacks merit, " . . . we affirm the judgment of conviction." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17291
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17367
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2000. 00-17367