judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. DAVID D. FREUDENTHAL, Governor of the State of Wyoming, and DR. BRENT SHERARD, Director of the Department of Health, in their capacity as custodian of records

Case Heading (S-09-0184)
Case Number:S-09-0184Case Docketed On:09/23/2009
Linked To: S-09-0183
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. DAVID D. FREUDENTHAL, Governor of the State of Wyoming, and DR. BRENT SHERARD, Director of the Department of Health, in their capacity as custodian of records
Full Title:CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. DAVID D. FREUDENTHAL, Governor of the State of Wyoming, and DR. BRENT SHERARD, Director of the Department of Health, in their capacity as custodian of records, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCheyenne Newspapers, Inc., a Wyoming corporationBruce T. Moats
AppelleeGovernor's OfficeBruce A. Salzburg
AppelleeDepartment of Health - Director's OfficeBruce A. Salzburg
Other Particpants
Amicus curiaeWyoming Education AssociationPatrick E. Hacker
Erin Maureen Kendall
Amicus curiaeEquality State Policy CenterPatrick E. Hacker
Erin Maureen Kendall
Amicus curiaeWyoming Trial Lawyers AssociationPatrick E. Hacker
Erin Maureen Kendall

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Public Records
Opinion Number:2010 WY 80
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/23/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/23/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/05/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2009Motion - Amicus - leave to participate and received proposed briefMotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
12/08/2009Order - Amicus - grant participationOrderAmicus - grant participationFinal
12/09/2009Brief - Amicus curiae. Hard copies will be filed this date.BriefAmicus curiaeFinal
12/10/2009Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
12/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees David D. Freudenthal and Dr. Brent SherardEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting Bruce A. Salzburg, Attorney General, for Governor Freudenthal and Dr. Sherard.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/20/2010Motion - Oral argument - leave to participateMotionOral argument - leave to participateFinal
01/20/2010Motion - Other - consent and joinder for amicus curiae to participate.MotionOtherFinal
01/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Amicus Curiae motion for leave to participate in oral argumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc. consent and joinder in Amicus Curiae motion for leave to participate in oral argumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bruce Moats for Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/09/2010Order - Denying Amicus Curiae Motion for Leave to Participate in Oral ArgumentOrderDenyFinal
02/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bruce Salzburg, Attorney General for appellants Freudenthal and Sherard; Bruce Moats for appellee Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/08/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/08/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal