judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JENNIFER CLARK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0144
Short Caption:JENNIFER CLARK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 11-CF-0084 Consolidated:11-CF-0144, 11-CF-0146
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-18693-09Filed Date:02/07/2011

Opening Event Date:02/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/02/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/18/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJennifer Clark Y
Kyle A. McGonigalYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/17/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-84, 11-CF-144 and 11-CF-146 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Kyle McGonigal, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Jennifer Clark in appeal no. 11-CF-144. F/O that Christine Pembroke, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Dewey B. Whitfield in appeal no. 11-CF-146. F/O that counsel for appellants Jennifer Clark and Dewey B. Whitfield shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court records and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with tis court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeals. (JAC)
02/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)(C. Clark) (RT Ordered/needed (pii)) 11-cf-84
03/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (Whitefield) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18 pgs/Hunt) 8/31/09 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (175 pgs/Lindsay) 11/2/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (210 pgs/Lindsay) 11/3/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (211-415 pgs/Lindsay) 11/4/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (416-555 pgs/Lindsay) 11/5/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (556-758 pgs/Lindsay) 11/8/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (759-945 pgs/Lindsay) 11/10/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (946-1127 pgs/Lindsay) 11/12/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (140 pgs/Pirfo) 11/15/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (141-171 pgs/Pirfo) 11/16/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (172 - 199 pgs/Pirfo) 11/17/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (20 pgs/tape) 1/14/11 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (9 pgs/tape) 2/3/11 proc. w/cd
04/12/2011RECORD COPIES (11-CF-84)
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CF-84)
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (SEALED pleadings)
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES (11-CF-146)
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CF-146)
04/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (SEALED pleadings)
04/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (J. Clark) (RT ordered/needed) (11-CF-146)
04/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Crystal Clark) appendix attached to brief
05/27/2011APPENDIX (Crystal Clark)
06/02/2011RECORD COPIES
06/02/2011RECORD INDEX
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (Jennifer Clark) no oppo
06/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 5, 2011 (no oppo) (Whitfield)
06/14/2011 On consideration of appellant Jennifer Clark's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, and the uncontested motion of appellant Dewey B. Whitfield for extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Clark is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 6, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant Whitfield is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 5, 2011. (Castillo)
08/03/2011FiledAppendix (Whitfield) (Appellant)
08/03/2011FiledBrief (Whitfield) (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File brief (Clark) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Jennifer Clark's motion for extension of time to 10/21/11.
10/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledMotion for inerim voucher (C. Clark) (Appellant)Denied
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Jennifer Clark's motion for extension of time to file brief and limited appendix to 12/5/11.
11/08/2011FiledORDER DENYING THE MOTION FOR INTERIM VOUCHERS
11/18/2011FiledMotion to sever appeal and reschedule briefing (Whitfiled) (Appellant)Denied
12/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until December 20, 2011 (Appellant) (J. Clark)Granted
01/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting motion of appellant Jennifer Clark to file the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
02/16/2012FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant Jennifer Clark to submit the brief and limited appendix w/in 10 days.
02/16/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Clark) (Appellant)Granted
02/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Clark) (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days.
02/23/2012FiledBrief (Clark) (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
02/23/2012FiledAppendix (Clark) (Appellant) attached to brief
03/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/27/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 5/10/12.
05/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
05/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/21/2012FiledMotion to compel appellee to address Whitfield's Brady issue. (Appellant)Denied
05/21/2012FiledReply Brief (D. Whitfield) (Appellant)
06/14/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte the motion to compel is hereby held in abeyance and referred to the merits panel upon assignment
06/20/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
07/03/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)
07/03/2012FiledOpposition to motion to compel. (Appellee)
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/11/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt Whitfield's motion to compel.
11/02/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Farrell
05/15/2013FiledVacated In Part/Affirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
05/23/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Whitfield) (Appellant)
05/28/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Rehearing (C. Clark) (Appellant)Granted
05/28/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Clark) (Appellant)
05/28/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Whitfield) (Appellant)
05/30/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing to July 12, 2013. (CRYSTAL S. CLARK)
06/06/2013FiledMandate (Jennifer Clark- 11-CF-144)
06/21/2013FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Whitfield) (Appellant)Denied as Moot
07/05/2013FiledOrder Denying aplt Whitfield's pro se motion for appointment of counsel.
07/17/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith. (C. CLARK)
07/18/2013FiledMandate (C.Clark ONLY)
11/05/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Whitfield)
11/18/2013FiledMandate (WHITFIELD 11-CF-146)