judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DELPIANO VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36400
Short Caption:DELPIANO VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A410924Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/20/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/11/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kolesar & Leatham, Chtd.-check no. 26540.
07/11/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. 00-11889
07/12/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Due Date: 10 days (affidavit).
07/26/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of Specially Appearing Defendant Dan Delpiano in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-12922
08/02/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-13383
09/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-15649
12/01/2000MotionFiled Motion. Real Party in Interest's Motion Requesting Permission to File Supplemental Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. 00-20977
12/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 00-22190
12/20/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/26/2000MotionFiled Motion. Withdraw as counsel for Petitioner. 00-22455
12/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. On December 20, 2000, this matter was submitted for decision, without oral argument, on the papers filed with this court. Because the resolution of this matter may not require any additional work of attorney patterson, we deny attorney Patterson's motion to withdraw as counsel. 00-22620
12/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. We conclude that the district court did not err in denying Delpiano's motion to quash service of process. "We therefore deny this petition." fn2[On Decemer 1, 2000, real party in interest Diamonds, Etc. filed a Motion Requesting Permission to file Supplemental Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. Since we have denied the petition for a writ of prohibition, we deny Diamond, Ect.'s motion as moot. The clerk of this court shall forthwith return, unfiled, the Supplemental Answer received November 29, 2000.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-22669
12/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Katherine K. Freberg: returned unfiled, the original Reply Party in Interest's Supplemental Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition, received November 29, 2000.
01/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. 01-00077
01/24/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-22747
01/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.