judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID D. FREUDENTHAL, Governor of the State of Wyoming, and DR. BRENT SHERARD, Director of the Department of Health, in their capacity as custodian of records v. CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-09-0183)
Case Number:S-09-0183Case Docketed On:09/23/2009
Linked To: S-09-0184
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:DAVID D. FREUDENTHAL, Governor of the State of Wyoming, and DR. BRENT SHERARD, Director of the Department of Health, in their capacity as custodian of records v. CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:DAVID D. FREUDENTHAL, Governor of the State of Wyoming, and DR. BRENT SHERARD, Director of the Department of Health, in their capacity as custodian of records, Appellants (Defendants), v. CHEYENNE NEWSPAPERS, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGovernor's OfficeBruce A. Salzburg
AppellantDepartment of Health - Director's OfficeBruce A. Salzburg
AppelleeCheyenne Newspapers, Inc., a Wyoming corporationBruce T. Moats

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Public Records
Opinion Number:2010 WY 80
Citation:233 P.3d 933 (Wyo. 2010).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/23/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/23/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/02/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
12/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of correction to appellee's brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting Bruce A. Salzburg, Attorney General, for Governor Freudenthal and Dr. Sherard.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bruce Moats for Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bruce Salzburg, Attorney General for appellants Freudenthal and Sherard; Bruce Moats for appellee Cheyenne Newspapers, Inc.) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/22/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/08/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/08/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal