judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CORNELIUS JACKSON V. SONJA MCKINNEY

Case Information: 11-CV-0143
Short Caption:CORNELIUS JACKSON V. SONJA MCKINNEYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB33530-10Filed Date:02/11/2011

Opening Event Date:02/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCornelius JacksonYPro SeN
AppelleeSonja MckinneyNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
02/15/2011TMC - appellant's EMERGENCY motion for stay
02/15/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's motion to stay
02/15/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED as apellant has failed to establish that he is likely to succeed on the merits of the appeal and he can minimize his harm by paying the Trans-Lux amount prior to eviction...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
02/15/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GLTHTE) (cb)
02/17/2011LodgedSTATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/11/11, 2/1/11 & 2/10/11) (elp)
02/17/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (attached to statement regarding transcript) (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 2/2/11, 2/1/11 & 2/10/11) (elp)
06/14/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED - from the aplt to the following: 2915 Pennsylvania Avenue, S.E. Apt #3 Washington, DC 20020
07/05/2011RECORD COPIES
07/05/2011RECORD INDEX
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (101-pgs/tape 2/1/11 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (19-pgs/tape 2/2/11 proc.)
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (25-pgs/tape 2/10/11/ proc.)w/cd
07/08/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/18/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/31/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave within 20 days
09/26/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
09/26/2011FiledDismissed
10/18/2011FiledMandate