judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERNANDEZ VS. SALAZAR

Case Information: 36421
Short Caption:HERNANDEZ VS. SALAZARCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A373328Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Buehler, BriceSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Eric H. Woods-check no. 026873.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12153
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Brice Buehler. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/27/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 5, 2000. Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 00-13061
07/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing Original Transcript Request and One Copy. 00-13104
08/07/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 00-13599
08/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On August 7, 2000, appellants filed a notice of withdrawal of appeal. Appellants' notice is treated as a motion for voluntary dismissal. Pursuant to appellants' motion, " . . . this appeal is dismissed."SNP/CLK 00-14390
08/17/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.