judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNY ODINE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0163
Short Caption:KENNY ODINE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1025-10Filed Date:02/10/2011

Opening Event Date:02/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenny Odine Y
Sarah StockwellNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sarah Stockwell, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/24/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sarah Stockwell, Esquire
03/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (50pgs/Zamora) 1/19/11 proc. w/CD
03/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (additional rt ordered)dfe
03/23/2011RECORD INDEX
03/23/2011RECORD COPIES
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD -#2 (4pgs/Tape) 6/29/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (7pgs/Tape) 8/27/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (12pgs/Tape) 12/9/10 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (50pgs/Zamora) 1/19/11 proc.
03/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (13pgs/Walker) 2/3/11 proc.
03/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo)
06/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 22, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY - pending the out- come of 23-110 motion filed in trial court (no oppo)
06/29/2011ORDERED: That the motion for stay is hereby held in abeyance for 90 days to permit the trial court to rule on the pending motion. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall advise this court on or before October 21, 2011, as to the status of the motion in the trial court. (By: ETW)
10/21/2011FiledStatement regarding status of Section - 23-110 D.C. Code (Appellant) (motion still pending)dfe
11/15/2011FiledThat appellant shall file a renewed statement on the status of the motion in the trial court on or before January 24, 2012. Appellant's motion to stay appeal remains held in abeyance
01/13/2012FiledStatus Report regarding -23-110 motion (pending) (Appellant)
03/05/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion for stay and directing briefing
03/05/2012FiledBriefing Order
04/10/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver attached (Appellant)Granted
04/20/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to dismiss appeal
04/20/2012FiledDismissed
05/14/2012FiledMandate