judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRENDA BANGS v. ROBERT E. SCHROTH

Case Heading (S-07-0012)
Case Number:S-07-0012Case Docketed On:01/16/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Professions and Occupations (Title 33)
Short Title:BRENDA BANGS v. ROBERT E. SCHROTH
Full Title:BRENDA BANGS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT E. SCHROTH, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrenda A. BangsWilliam R. Fix
Jenna V. Mandraccia
AppelleeRobert E. SchrothRobert M. Shively
Amy M. Taheri

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 20
Citation:201 P.3d 442

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/16/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/16/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/01/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant - unopposedMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/12/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
04/26/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/14/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robert Shively and Amy TaheriNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/23/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/06/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
06/06/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Robert M. Shively and Amy M. Taheri on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jenna MandracciaNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting for Jenna Mandraccia to appear on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented before full Court, Jenna V. Mandraccia for the appellant; Amy M. Taheri for the Appellee and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/13/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/11/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal