judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SMITH, RONALD W. PFB

Case Information: 81-AA-1008
Short Caption:SMITH, RONALD W. PFBClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:08/14/1981

Opening Event Date:08/14/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/27/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/18/1982
Argued/Submitted:09/09/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, RONALD W. PFB RELIEF BOARD, ET AL.
08/14/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/27/1981FiledRecord Completed
06/18/1982FiledBriefing Completed
09/09/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/28/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition