judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BELT (CORNELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34631
Short Caption:BELT (CORNELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38553 , 47142 , 47201
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C153525Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07266
09/03/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due on or before: September 8, 1999. 99-08284
09/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08569
09/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08570
09/30/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-09387
10/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/17/99, 5/4/99. Court Reporters: Cathy Nelson, Kristine Cornelius. 99-09817
10/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The fast track response shall be filed within 10 days of this order. 99-09836
10/12/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09870
10/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-09871
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09945
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11894
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-11894