judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

IMOGENE DRIVER v. WORTH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Case: A-4530
A-4530
02/25/1954
Application for Writ of Error
IMOGENE DRIVER
WORTH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/29/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/05/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
02/25/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/03/1955Response to Motion filed
12/29/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/15/1954Dissenting opinion issued.
12/15/1954Opinion issued
05/12/1954Miscellaneous Motion
05/07/1954Letter Filed
04/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
03/05/1954Response to Petition
02/25/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/25/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Imogene DriverPetitioner
Worth Construction CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information