judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEVADA READY MIX VS. JONES

Case Information: 36420
Short Caption:NEVADA READY MIX VS. JONESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A393598Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/17/2000 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jill M. Lynne-check no. 2203.
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12150
07/17/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/25/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 13, 2000. 00-14957
09/18/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-16454
09/18/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/26/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-17009
10/06/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-17730
11/08/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-19674
01/29/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 01/26/01. 01-01886
01/29/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-01889
03/02/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 02/28/01. 01-03868
04/11/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
08/07/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk regarding Transmission of Transcript: "Transcript of Proceedings Before the Appeals Officer".
08/17/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings before Gregory Krohn, Appeals Officer, submitted by Clark County Clerk. 01-13997
08/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 9, 2001, at 11:30 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/ NB)
08/29/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Resetting of Oral Argument. 01-14613
09/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. We grant respondent's motion to continue the oral argument of this matter. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for October 9, 2001, at 11:30 a.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument in December 2001, in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 01-15751
10/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 11, 2001, at 11:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
11/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 01-19705
12/03/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On November 26, 2001, appellant filed a motion to voluntarily withdraw this appeal. Cause appearing, we grant the motion and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We vacate the oral argument scheduled in this appeal for December 11, 2001, at 11:00 a.m.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20135
12/03/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.