judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KERRY JOHN HATZENBIHLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0111)
Case Number:S-11-0111Case Docketed On:05/04/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:KERRY JOHN HATZENBIHLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KERRY JOHN HATZENBIHLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKerry John HatzenbihlerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/04/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/17/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time To File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/05/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for second extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/14/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
07/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/15/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal