judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS GLEN PEDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0167)
Case Number:S-09-0167Case Docketed On:08/28/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:THOMAS GLEN PEDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:THOMAS GLEN PEDERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas Glen PedersonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/28/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/14/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/09/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
11/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal