judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERGUSON VS. FERGUSON

Case Information: 36386
Short Caption:FERGUSON VS. FERGUSONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34004
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9708030Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/10/2000 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kevin J. Mirch Ltd.--check no. 6733.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11477
07/10/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We order these appeals stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. The mandatory settlement conference proceedings in these appeals are suspended, pending resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings or an order of the bankruptcy court lifting the automatic stay and permitting the settlement conference proceedings to go forward. Counsel for appellant Ferguson shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a report of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Nos. 34004, 36386 (cases are not consolidated.) Document No. 00-14163.
09/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, these appeals shall proceed. The settlement judge shall have 30 days from the date of this order to schedule these appeals for a settlement conference (nos. 34004/36386). 00-16630
02/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We order these appeals stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Counsel for Western States shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Nos. 34004/36386 (cases are not consolidated.) 01-03533
05/10/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Supreme Court Order Re: Status Report. Nos. 34004 and 36386 (not consolidated). (01-07878)
07/12/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/10/00; 1/11/00; 1/12/00; 1/14/00; 1/18/00; 1/19/00; 1/21/00; 1/24/00; 1/25/00; 1/26/00; 1/28/00; 1/31/00. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson 01-11819
08/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Simon has filed a status report informing this court that the US Bankruptcy Court entered an order vacating the automatic stay to permit resolution of these appeals. Cause appearing, these appeals shall proceed. The settlement judge shall have 30 days from the date of this order to schedule these appeals for a settlement conference. Nos. 34004 and 36836 (not consolidated). (01-14045)
11/30/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-20097
01/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellants shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 02-01736
02/28/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 02-03694
07/30/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order to Show Cause and Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 36386/34004 - filed in case no. 36386 because of the motion to consolidate. 02-13693
08/07/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 02-13461
08/09/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 36386/34004. 02-13694
10/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 34004 and Denying Motion to Consolidate. ORDER the appeal in Docket No. 34004 DISMISSED and DENY as moot the motion to consolidate. Nos. 34004 and 36386-cases are not consolidated. 02-17478
10/31/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appelllants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 02-18731
12/03/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 02-20660
01/23/2003MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation and Dismissal of Appeal as to Certain Parties. 03-01236
03/18/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 23, 2003, appellants and the Ferguson respondents stipulated to the dismissal of this appeal 'as to those Respondents without prejudice to Appellants' right to pursue the Appeal in Supreme Court Case No. 34004.' We note that the appeal in Docket No. 34004 was dismissed by this court on October 9, 2002. Accordingly, we disapprove the parties' stipulation. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss this appeal as to the Ferguson respondents without prejudice or inform the court of the status of this appeal. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed pursuant to the Bankruptcy Court Settlement and Order to Comply with Settlement. Failure to respond timely to this order may result in this appeal being dismissed as abandoned. 03-04579
03/31/2003MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. as to the Ferguson respondents. 03-05298
06/04/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On March 31,2003, appellant and the Ferguson respondents filed a stipulation to dismiss this appeal as to the Ferguson respondents. We approve the stipulation and " . . . dismiss this appeal as to the Ferguson respondents . . . we also dismiss this appeal, as abandoned, as to all remaining respondents." NP03-RR/WM/MG 03-09337
07/01/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-09943
07/01/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/14/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 7, 2003. 03-09943
12/04/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reinstate Appeal and Recall Remittitur on the Basis of Inadvertence and Excusable Neglect. 03-20242
12/12/2003MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Reinstate Appeal and Recall Remittitur on the Basis of Inadvertence and Excusable Neglet. 03-20709
02/04/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. 04-02234
02/11/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Reinstate Appeal. On June 4, 2003, this court entered an order dismissing this appeal. Appellants have moved this court to reinstate their appeal. Respondents Wesley Adams, James Ludwig and Western States Management Services, Ltd., oppose the motion. No good cause appearing, we deny the motion. 04-02631