judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

COL-TEX REFINING COMPANY v. COFFIELD AND GUTHERIE, INC.

Case: A-4567
A-4567
03/16/1954
Application for Writ of Error
COL-TEX REFINING COMPANY
COFFIELD AND GUTHERIE, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/28/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
04/21/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/31/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/24/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/28/1954Brief in Support of Petition
04/21/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/31/1954Reply to Response
03/24/1954Response to Petition
03/16/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/16/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Coffield and Gutherie, Inc.Respondent
Col-Tex Refining CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information